Trustees BURBAGE METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1169141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Patricia Mukorombindo | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||
COLIN HADDON | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALAN KEITH WARE | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||
HILARY ELAINE UNION | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN NICHOLS | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA REARDON | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
MRS ANNE HADDON | Trustee | 09 October 2014 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER WEBB | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANNE BAILEY | Trustee | 18 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ARMSTRONG | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|||||
DAVID BLACK | Trustee | 14 April 2011 |
|
|||||
GILLIAN KEARNEY | Trustee | 01 September 2006 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN JAMES BRADBURN | Trustee | 01 May 2006 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY LESLEY BRADBURN | Trustee | 01 September 1997 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.