Trustees THE FRUITERERS' FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1170544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Bishop | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Stephen James Challacombe | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Arthur Blair | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Charles Hancock Mr | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor John Frederick Price | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ROBERT WARNER | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Stephen Olins JP | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.