Trustees THE DOCKLANDS TRAIL
Charity number: 1171279
Charity reporting is up to date (194 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Allan James | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Cummins | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Maguire He/Him | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Williams | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BIRCHALL LLB | Trustee | 28 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BRADBURY | Trustee | 28 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW WILSON | Trustee | 28 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
REV. CANON NEVILLE BLACK MBE | Trustee | 28 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE ELLIS | Trustee | 28 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
HARVEY DODGSON BA | Trustee | 28 July 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.