Accounts and annual returns The Community Charity Fund for Brentwood
Charity number: 1173309
Charity reporting is overdue by 1268 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 172 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 172 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 538 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 538 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 903 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 903 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1268 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1268 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | 27 February 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | 27 February 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window