Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SHAW CUM DONNINGTON
Charity number: 1172611
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Raymond Clive Obin | Chair | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosamund Gillian Stuart | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derek Harwood | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Eleanor Almond | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mary Moore | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Edward John Charles Yates | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Theresa Lawrence Breach | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Richard Joplin | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Willetts | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARY VERONICA DAWKINS | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARK HUTSON | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mike Stuart | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA JANE BRADFORD | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL HASLAM | Trustee | 17 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MARY GOLDSACK | Trustee | 17 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.