Accounts and annual returns BUMBLEBEES PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1173067
Charity reporting is overdue by 1540 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 79 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 79 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 445 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 445 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 810 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 810 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1175 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1175 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1540 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1540 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window