Trustees SADLERS WELLS COMMUNITY WOODLAND CIO
Charity number: 1171849
Charity reporting is up to date (98 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr KATHERINE FRANCES CLARE HUTCHINSON | Chair | 14 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Mitchelson | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Hitchmough | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael JOHN Thomas | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Fairclough | Trustee | 14 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derek Burrows | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN BOURNE | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|||||
DAVID CLAPPERTON | Trustee | 24 April 2020 |
|
|||||
ROBERT WILLIAM HARRIS | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Andrew Thomas Moore | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Nicola Mary Badger | Trustee | 21 July 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.