Trustees PARTICIPATORY CITY FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1175174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL CHARLES COUGHLIN | Chair | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Noel Moka | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Smith | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosanna Vitiello | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Maisha Akil Scafe-Smith | Trustee | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Edward hook | Trustee | 21 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roland Harwood | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alessandro Ricci | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Elizabeth Looney | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|||||
HANNAH CONNIE RIGNELL | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.