Trustees 7th Wyre Forest (Comberton and Offmore) Scout Group
Charity number: 509585
Charity reporting is up to date (69 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN STRONGMAN TD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ryan Douglas Clarke | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emily Grace Kelly Barnett | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Richard Brookes | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
RACHEL MARIA ADAMS | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
David Martin Green | Trustee | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
DENISE ANDERSON | Trustee | 27 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER BUDDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.