Governing document COMMUNITY CHRISTIAN CENTRE OF CHURCH OF GOD SEVENTH DAY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 SEP 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03 MAY 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 APR 2017 as amended on 15 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
1. The advancement of the Christian religion in Wembley and in such other parts of the United Kingdom as well as in Jamaica and other parts of the West Indies as well as parts of Africa as the trustees may from time to time decide including but not limited to the provision of a place of worship and raising awareness and understanding of religious beliefs. 2.The belief and/or prevention of poverty in Wembley and in such other parts of the United Kingdom as well as Jamaica and other parts of the West Indies as well as parts of Africa as the charity trustees may from time to time decide including but not limited to providing food and clothing to the homeless.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.