Trustees GIRLGUIDING WEST YORKSHIRE SOUTH
Charity number: 509670
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Coulson | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Bagnall | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Margaret Pearson | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katie McGee | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Ollerton | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Brown | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN LONGBOTTOM | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Barker | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sally Jane Collinson | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.