Trustees NORTHERN YOUTH THEATRE PROJECT
Charity number: 1173526
Charity reporting is overdue by 960 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brynn Younger Banks | Chair | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Morgan Alice Gooding | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nia Georgia Hosie | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Erin Lorna June Younger Banks | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Oliver George Wood | Trustee | 11 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Zara Overton | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Densley | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hope Jamieson | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN HOSIE | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE EMMA COLEMAN | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.