Governing document WARRINGTON TRAINING TRUST LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 JUNE 1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 22 APR 1980, CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14 MARCH 2003, SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 21 MAY 2008 AND 16 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: (A) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING WITHIN A 10 MILE RADIUS OF WARRINGTON TOWN HALL, CHESHIRE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF BURSARIES AND GRANTS FOR TRAINING. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: (A) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING WITHIN A 10 MILE RADIUS OF WARRINGTON TOWN HALL, CHESHIRE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF BURSARIES AND GRANTS FOR TRAINING. (B) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF AFFORDABLE, EASY ACCESS ACCOMMODATION TO ENCOURAGE BUSINESS START UP AND DEVELOPMENT WITHIN THE WARRINGTON AREA
Area of benefit
AREA WITHIN TEN MILES OF WARRINGTON TOWN HALL, WARRINGTON, CHESHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.