Accounts and annual returns NEW JERUSALEM AMBITION MINISTRIES
Charity number: 1174030
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 16 September 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 16 September 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 12 October 2022 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 12 October 2022 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 07 February 2022 | 130 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 07 February 2022 | 130 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 12 October 2020 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2018 | 27 February 2020 | 150 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2018 | 27 February 2020 | 150 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window