Accounts and annual returns FEED THE SOUL
Charity number: 1177408
Charity reporting is overdue by 170 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 170 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 170 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 November 2023 | 292 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 November 2023 | 292 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 March 2023 | 405 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 March 2023 | 405 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2022 | 395 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2021 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 02 March 2022 | 761 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window