Accounts and annual returns PLAN B
Charity number: 1176022
Charity reporting is overdue by 351 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 351 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 351 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 18 January 2023 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 18 January 2023 | 140 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 05 April 2022 | 217 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 18 January 2023 | 505 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 205 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | 03 March 2020 | 185 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | 24 March 2021 | 571 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window