Governing document EASTBOURNE DEMENTIA ACTION ALLIANCE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 26 MAR 2018 AS AMENDED ON 21 SEP 2020 AMENDED ON 01 SEP 2020 AMENDED ON 25 NOV 2021 as amended on 17 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF NEED AND THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, BY UNDERTAKING INITIATIVES TO HELP TO MAKE EASTBOURNE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS A DEMENTIA INCLUSIVE AND FRIENDLY COMMUNITY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY LISTENING AND RESPONDING TO THE LIVED EXPERIENCES OF PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA AND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, WORKSHOPS AND AWARENESS SESSIONS THAT ARE DESIGNED TO ENSURE THAT PEOPLE AFFECTED BY DEMENTIA FEEL UNDERSTOOD AND INCLUDED AND CAN CONFIDENTLY CONTRIBUTE TO COMMUNITY LIFE; BY WORKING IN PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN EAST SUSSEX AND ACROSS THE UK ON PROJECTS WHICH AIM TO IMPROVE THE CAPACITY OF COMMUNITIES TO SUPPORT PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.