Trustees GREAT GONERBY MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 1174315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CARLESS IAN BARRIE SKELLERN | Chair | 29 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Fraser Tipton | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Witheridge | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Walton | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Nash | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mathew Trim | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Annette Callow | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Frank SAWARD | Trustee | 26 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Glendyr Saward | Trustee | 26 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MAYER | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANET THOMPSON | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEFF THOMPSON | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER CRITCHLEY | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.