Trustees DURHAM BIRD CLUB
Charity number: 1176232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW KINGHORN | Chair | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD COWEN | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|||||
JAQUELINE LOUISE HAMER | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Parker | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Murphy | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Thomas Bell | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Matthew Middleton | Trustee | 02 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LESLIE SOWERBUTTS | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARK ANTHONY HARPER | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.