Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S WALSGRAVE
Charity number: 1174550
Charity reporting is up to date (189 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Malcolm Tyler | Chair | 26 January 1991 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Nigel Baker | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Stephen White | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Keeling | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Phyllis Jean Hudson | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Norris Yuen Kuen Poon | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE HELEN BAKER | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA JAYNE HARWOOD | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
GARY ALAN CROSHAW | Trustee | 01 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
MERVYN HENRY HANCOX | Trustee | 01 April 2010 |
|
|
||||
JOHN LYNDELL ASPDEN | Trustee | 02 April 2008 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA HANCOX | Trustee | 01 April 2008 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY PAUL THISTLEWOOD | Trustee | 01 April 1990 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.