Accounts and annual returns KHAIRUL UMMAH TRUST
Charity number: 1175037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 July 2023 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 July 2023 | 175 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 June 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 March 2022 | 421 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 10 June 2020 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 28 March 2022 | 787 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window