Trustees THE MARJORIE DEANE FINANCIAL JOURNALISM FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1178876
Charity reporting is overdue by 412 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zanny Minton Beddoes | Chair | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Daniel Ellis Franklin | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Sarah Williams | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Ritvik Carvalho | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Alice Mary Fulwood | Trustee | 23 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Tom Easton | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
RUPERT PENNANT-REA | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Henry Boucher | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
MICHAEL CRONK | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
PENNY CHAPMAN | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.