Trustees FRESHSTART SMART
Charity number: 1178047
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAWTEE MAHARAJ | Chair | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Mccormick | Trustee | 22 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fatima Suleyman | Trustee | 22 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Clarke | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Thompson | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Taylor | Trustee | 10 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
JERMAINE WILSON | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
KILOLO NAYBEI | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANGELA ROBINSON | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.