Trustees CHESHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 511356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael David Rollinson JP DL | Chair | 08 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Soiphet Sirisot | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carl Askew | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Oliver Savage JP | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Skinner | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Philip Duley | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Luke William Thornton | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jake Vickery | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
David William Hopley | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Christopher Cox | Trustee | 11 June 2004 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.