Accounts and annual returns SHERINGHAM COMMUNITY SMALLHOLDING
Charity number: 1179151
Charity reporting is overdue by 17 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 17 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 17 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 07 April 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 25 June 2023 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 13 January 2023 | 227 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 13 January 2023 | 227 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 13 January 2023 | 592 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 13 January 2023 | 592 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 13 January 2023 | 957 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 13 January 2023 | 957 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window