Trustees NORTON CANES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 511674
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAUREEN HOPLEY | Chair | 27 August 2015 |
|
|||||
Dale Bilbie | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Preece | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Philip Joseph Reeves | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Josh Newbury | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE MARGARET EARP | Trustee | 24 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNIE BETTS | Trustee | 07 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENNY DUNN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.