Accounts and annual returns LIVING HOPE CHRISTIAN CHURCH MANCHESTER
Charity number: 1178327
Charity reporting is up to date (188 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 188 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 188 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 323 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 323 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 10 March 2021 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 10 March 2021 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | 10 November 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | 10 November 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window