Trustees WORLE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1181001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY WILLIAM DOLLING | Chair | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Ann Orbell | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Alexander Bennett | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Redington | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Orbell | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Jean Bennett | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNE SKINNER | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.