Trustees THE GREAT MOOR & DISTRICT WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1179183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANN BECKETT LUCKOCK | Chair | 24 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Yvonne Kitchen | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Holebrook | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Douglas | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Allcock | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ruth Johnson | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
lynda Margaret Smith | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
IRIS CHRISTINA MCDONOUGH | Trustee | 26 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANNE HALL | Trustee | 17 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANN WOODSMITH | Trustee | 16 December 2010 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.