COMPOSITIONALITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Compositionality is an academic society. Notably, it publishes a free, open-access academic journal for research using compositional ideas, most notably of a category-theoretic origin, in any discipline.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People
4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 August 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joshua Tan | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR BOB COECKE | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Willerton | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY GIBBONS | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.19k | £719 | £717 | £937 | £231 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 June 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 June 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 15 December 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 15 December 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT IS THE CIO IS THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH IN THE AREA OF COMPOSITIONAL IDEAS IN SCIENCE AND MATHEMATICS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: - CREATING AND SUSTAINING AN INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITY FOR RESEARCH - CREATING AND MAINTAINING A NON-COMMERCIAL, INTERNATIONAL, OPEN PUBLISHING PLATFORM COMMITTED TO THE CODE OF GOOD SCIENTIFIC PRACTICE AND A SCIENTIFIC OPEN ACCESS ON-LINE JOURNAL (“THE JOURNAL”).
Contact information
- Address:
-
108 KENNINGTON ROAD
KENNINGTON
OXFORD
OX1 5PE
- Phone:
- 07881333990
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window