Trustees BOURNE UNITED CHARITIES
Charity number: 1183638
Charity reporting is up to date (247 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Stephen Buckman | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mallett | Trustee | 28 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Fellows | Trustee | 28 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Watson | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Bennett | Trustee | 07 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Fiona Louise Pembery | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Anna Sylvia Kelly | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|||||
JOHN ALFRED KIRKMAN | Trustee | 31 December 2019 |
|
|||||
DAVID STANLEY MAPP | Trustee | 31 December 2019 |
|
|||||
IVAN JOHN STEPHEN FULLER | Trustee | 31 December 2019 |
|
|||||
JOYCE EDITH BURROWS | Trustee | 31 December 2019 |
|
|||||
GEOFFREY RICHARD GREATWOOD | Trustee | 31 December 2019 |
|
|||||
TREVOR HOLLINSHEAD | Trustee | 25 December 2019 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.