Trustees THE ADJUTANT GENERAL'S CORPS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1185298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colonel Victoria Jane Whiting ADC | Chair | 04 June 2021 |
|
|||||
BERNADETTE AMELIA LABUSCHAGNE | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Robert Joliffe Oram | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David John Rutherford | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Craig Terblanche | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Wayne Heathcote | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Colonel Douglas James Hutchinson | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.