Trustees STOKE CLIMSLAND PARISH HALL CIO
Charity number: 1182193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin James Howlett | Chair | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Lupton | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA CHRISTINE CRAWLEY | Trustee | 28 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Edith Bonita Jane Lightfoot | Trustee | 02 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Geoffrey Alan Giles | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth louise Power | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.