Trustees 7th Warrington West Scout Group
Charity number: 512601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Susan Degenhart | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Jane Wood | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire McManus | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Paul McManus | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy George Walker | Trustee | 14 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Chris Degenhart | Trustee | 07 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Sherratt | Trustee | 11 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
David John Goodfellow | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|||||
VANESSA GOODFELLOW | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIE BLEASDALE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.