Trustees CLAYGATE RECREATION GROUND TRUST
Charity number: 1180381
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Mark Full | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Declan Leonard | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Smith | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Murray Cunningham | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan James Brown | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Grainger Taggart | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy James Nuthall | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gareth David Incledon | Trustee | 19 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Caroline Jones | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Harding | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elisse Jones | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Fiona Chapman | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Ann Scott | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Rollings | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SNELLING | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.