Trustees MAIDSTONE LIONS CLUB
Charity number: 1182988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter James Stonely | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Priestley | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marion Rosemary Brooks | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Graham Hooper | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Brown McWalter | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derek Edward Ransley | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Michael Woods | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Warren Luxton | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Susanne Woods | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.