Accounts and annual returns NORTH WOLDS LIONS CLUB
Charity number: 1180423
Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 458 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 458 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 823 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 823 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 August 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 02 August 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 04 September 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 04 September 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window