Trustees MOUNT HAWKE YOUTH AND COMMUNITY GROUP
Charity number: 1182950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peran Clemence | Chair | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Poppy Cheal | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven William Puente | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Brooks | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Edward Hunt | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Davey | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eugene Clemence | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Shilton | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Elizabeth Luckwell | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.