Trustees THORNBURY VOLUNTEER CENTRE
Charity number: 1180775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Ray | Chair | 13 January 1997 |
|
|
||||
FRANK ANTONY CHARLES TUSTIN | Trustee | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Lois Mason | Trustee | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Robert Fisher | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALLAN EDWARD TAYLOR | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
PENNY TAYLOR | Trustee | 17 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALAN BERNARD PAYNE | Trustee | 14 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA MARY GRUNDELL | Trustee | 22 March 2004 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.