Trustees ASHBY U3A
Charity number: 1181242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Pilgrim | Chair | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Estelle Sandles | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glenys Morrice | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Godwin | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Woodland | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Iain Bruce Banns | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
William James Wilson | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Ann Reed | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Colin David Ellis | Trustee | 26 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Stow | Trustee | 28 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anthony David Smith | Trustee | 28 July 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.