Trustees HEALTH SERVICES RESEARCH UK
Charity number: 1182643
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Judith Anne Smith | Chair | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ashrafunnesa Khanom | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Yvonne Frances Birks | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Rachel Laidlaw | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter John Bower | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nina Mei Hemmings | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gemma McKenna-Martin | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pearl Shirley Adikwor Saadi | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Newton | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Temidayo Mary Ajakaiye FCCA DChA | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Gary Ashley Ford | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tara Lamont | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Angus Ian Gerard Ramsay | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Hutchings | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kieran Michael Joseph Walshe PhD | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.