Trustees PELVIC, OBSTETRIC AND GYNAECOLOGICAL PHYSIOTHERAPY (POGP)
Charity number: 1181424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Kate Lough | Chair | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Stephenson | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Alebon | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Dillon | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grainne Donnelly | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Shepherd MSc | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Harvey Dixon FCSP | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Miti Rach | Trustee | 09 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gillian Campbell | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Plowman | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Bustard MSc | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.