Trustees PENDLE HIPPODROME THEATRE LIMITED
Charity number: 513275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN MASON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Matthew Hargreaves | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Lisa Manley | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil James GOODALL | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Nelson | Trustee | 08 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Derick Cleaver | Trustee | 24 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stevan Manley | Trustee | 25 February 2014 |
|
|||||
David Farrer | Trustee | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR JOE WHITTAM | Trustee |
|
||||||
KARIN MICHELLE WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL SMITH THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
KEITH WALTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.