Trustees ISLAMIC OUTREACH PROJECT
Charity number: 1186933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Naveed Ahmed | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mir Aman Ullah | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Qasim Iqbal | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Shafiq | Trustee | 29 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Saleem Hussain | Trustee | 29 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Irfan Jehangir | Trustee | 29 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ayub Pervaz | Trustee | 29 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Pervaiz Khan | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.