Governing document BROUGHTON AND BRETTON COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MAY 1981 AS AMENDED 4 DECEMBER 1984, 25 MAY 1990,16 JUNE 1995 AND 13 JUNE 1997 AND 11 JUNE 1999.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BROUGHTON AND BRETTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFRT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF CONSTITUTION.)
Area of benefit
BROUGHTON AND BRETTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.