Governing document DURHAM CITY CENTRE YOUTH PROJECT
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/03/1982 AS AMENDED ON 27/05/1999 AS AMENDED ON 27/01/2000 AS AMENDED ON 26/06/2002 AS AMENDED ON 19/05/2011
Charitable objects
TARGETED FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 11-25YRS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF GENDER, ETHNICITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, DISABILITY, POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS BELIEFS OR OTHER OPINIONS 2.1 TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES TO SUPPORT AND ASSIST YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA FORMALLY KNOWN AS CITY OF DURHAM DISTRICT (HEREIN AND AFTER KNOWN AS THE AREA OF BENEFIT) PARTICULARLY THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF ADVANCING EDUCATION, IMPROVING SOCIAL WELFARE AND IN DOING SO ENHANCING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE, PHYSICAL HEALTH AND EMOTIONAL WELL BEING 2.2 TO PROVIDE SUPPORT, ACTIVITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS AND ENCOURAGE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN THE DECISION MAKING PROCESS OF RELEVANT COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS WITH WHOM THEY WORK. 2.3 TO SUPPORT, ADVISE AND MANAGE PROJECTS WHICH COMPLIMENT THE OBJECTS OF THE PROJECT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.