Trustees NEW MEANING FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1184616
Charity reporting is overdue by 50 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN CHRISTOPHER EVANS BSC | Chair | 27 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Dawson | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Isobel Powlett Orde | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Zipp | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexander George Ward Beckett | Trustee | 15 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE GERALDINE EVANS | Trustee | 20 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.