Trustees 2ND KNUTSFORD SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1181999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Russell Andrew Finn | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Redhead | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Flynn | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Waters | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Hogg | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Horne | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Wall | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY BASTON | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert Walley | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.