Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KIRKBYMOORSIDE WITH GILLAMOOR, FARNDALE, BRANSDALE & EDSTONE
Charity number: 1182973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lilla Clark | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Robson | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Andrews | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Jaime Sunderland | Trustee | 25 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Storey | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WOOSNAM | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Mumford | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Wesley | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN ALEC HELM | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Bridget Gillespie | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne WARRINER | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JAMES MUMFORD | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATRINA LANE | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|||||
CLARE HAYNES | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
JILL HUGILL | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
WILFRID LESLIE CLARKE | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CASTLE | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA ROBINSON | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP LESLIE COLLIER | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELEANOR MARGARET DOWSLAND | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.