Trustees ROYAL AIR FORCE SPORT AIRCRAFT
Charity number: 1184646
Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gp Capt Stephen Wetton LL.B FRAeS | Chair | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Brian Fyfield BSc | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lloyd Edmondson | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Williams | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Glen Holden | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carl Jenkins MEng | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wing Commander GARY PAUL COLEMAN | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Squadron Leader CHRISTOPHER MARTIN HIVES | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Alistair James Seymour MA BSc | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Air Marshal Sir Christopher Harper KBE FRAeS | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.